Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-François-Clet Peschoud

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1805Born
14 Mar 182924.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 186358.3SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
28 Sep 186358.6ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
30 Nov 186358.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
13 Sep 186560.6DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-François-Clet Peschoud
Bishop Joseph-François-Clet Peschoud (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Claude, Diocese of Saint-Claude
Ordained BishopRocamadour

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017