Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Doney

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1794BornEpeugney
18 Oct 181823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
28 Nov 184349.0SelectedBishop of Montauban, France
22 Jan 184449.1ConfirmedBishop of Montauban, France
15 Mar 184449.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
21 Jan 187176.1DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Doney:
Bishop Jean-Marie Doney (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015