Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Antoine-Auguste Bélaval

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1802Born
20 May 182624.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 185856.3SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
27 Sep 185856.4ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
30 Nov 185856.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
4 Feb 188178.8DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Antoine-Auguste Bélaval (VIAF: 133216304)
Bishop Jean-Antoine-Auguste Bélaval (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017