Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Alexandre Roullet de la Bouillerie

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux, France

Titular Archbishop of Perge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1810Born
10 Apr 184131.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
20 Feb 185544.9SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
23 Mar 185545.0ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
20 May 185545.2Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
16 Dec 187262.7SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux, France
21 Mar 187363.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux, France
21 Mar 187363.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Perge
8 Jul 188272.3DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for François-Alexandre Roullet de la Bouillerie (VIAF: 7519496)
Archbishop François-Alexandre Roullet de la Bouillerie (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 162, and Page 181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016