Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand-Joseph Fava

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1826Born
5 Jan 185124.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 187144.9SelectedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
6 Mar 187145.0ConfirmedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
25 Jul 187145.4Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
14 Aug 187549.5SelectedBishop of Grenoble, France
23 Sep 187549.6ConfirmedBishop of Grenoble, France
18 Nov 187549.7InstalledBishop of Grenoble, France
17 Oct 189973.6DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Armand-Joseph Fava (VIAF: 46886883)
Bishop Armand-Joseph Fava (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEvin-Malmaison
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montauban, Diocese of Montauban

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 290, and Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017