Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Chausse, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1846Born
21 Aug 187124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
12 May 189144.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
12 May 189144.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
12 Jul 189144.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
30 Jan 189447.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Chausse
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Chausse S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarlhes, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained BishopLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France

  • a priest for 22.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018