Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Antoine Lang, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin

Titular Bishop of Parlais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1868BornNiederschaeffelsheim, France
19 Jul 189122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
23 Jul 190233.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria
23 Jul 190233.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Parlais
9 Nov 190234.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parlais
2 Jan 191243.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Antoine Lang:
Bishop Joseph-Antoine Lang S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Costa di Benin

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 441
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013