Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Martin Adam, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gabon, Gabon

Titular Bishop of Thmuis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1846Born
17 Nov 187226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Feb 189750.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon
16 Feb 189750.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thmuis
6 Jun 189750.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thmuis
7 May 191467.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon
14 Jan 192982.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gabon, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Jean Martin Adam (VIAF: 313553218)
Bishop Jean Martin Adam C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gabon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSigolsheim, Diocese of Strasbourg, France
Ordained BishopLibreville, Vicariate Apostolic of Gabon

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 550
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017