Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armengol Coll y Armengol, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea

Titular Bishop of Thignica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1859Born
24 Sep 188122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
Aug 1890³31.5AppointedPrefect of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea
10 May 190445.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea
10 May 190445.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thignica
19 Jun 190445.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thignica
21 Apr 191859.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Armengol Coll y Armengol
Bishop Armengol Coll y Armengol C.M.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbars, Spain

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017