Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Virili

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1849BornSupino
25 Jun 190152.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
29 Jun 190152.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
14 Jan 191565.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya
9 Mar 192575.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Virili:
Archbishop Raffaele Virili (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya

  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 568
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014