Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Marco Tei, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1846BornPieve di Controne, di Bagni di Lucca
4 Apr 186922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Nov 190458.6AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
20 Nov 190458.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
28 Apr 191670.0DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Marco Tei:
Bishop Paolo Marco Tei O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013