Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Francesco Carrara, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eritrea

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1871BornAlbino, Italy
Dec 1910³39.7AppointedPrefect of Eritrea
7 Feb 191139.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eritrea
7 Feb 191139.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
26 Feb 191139.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
15 Jun 192453.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Eritrea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Francesco Carrara:
Bishop Camillo Francesco Carrara O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eritrea

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 40
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013