Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Maria Radini-Tedeschi

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1857BornPiacenza
1879¹21.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 190547.5AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
29 Jan 190547.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
22 Aug 191457.1DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Maria Radini-Tedeschi:
Bishop Giacomo Maria Radini-Tedeschi (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 3
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013