Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Giovanni Battista Scalabrini

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1839Born
20 Sep 186223.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Como, Italy
30 May 186323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Como, Italy
28 Jan 187636.5AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
30 Jan 187636.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
13 Feb 187636.5InstalledBishop of Piacenza, Italy
1 Jun 190565.8DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
9 Nov 1997Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Giovanni Battista Scalabrini (VIAF: 20490421)
Bishop Bl. Giovanni Battista Scalabrini (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFino Mornasco, Diocese of Como
Ordained BishopCollegio di Propaganda Fide, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 458
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 7
  • opd/loc: AM, 11 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast