Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Marzorati

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1818Born
26 Jul 183516.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 183516.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 185839.5AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
4 Jul 185839.6Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
25 Mar 186546.3DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Marzorati
Bishop Giuseppe Marzorati (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopS. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1862
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017