Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giosuč Signori

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1859Born
25 Mar 188323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
15 Apr 191050.3AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
16 May 191050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
23 Dec 191859.0AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
21 Nov 192161.9AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
25 Nov 192363.9DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giosuč Signori
Archbishop Giosuč Signori (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCommenduno

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 45
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast