Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Zuccarino

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1898Born
25 Jul 192325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
5 Jan 195152.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
5 Jan 195152.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
11 Feb 195153.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
19 Mar 195153.1InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
29 Nov 195355.8AppointedBishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
24 Aug 197375.5DiedBishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Zuccarino
Bishop Pietro Zuccarino (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBusalla, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained PriestSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova
Death PlaceOspedale Galliera, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria Assunta, Cathedral, Bobbio, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano)

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018