Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Zambarbieri

Deceased

Bishop of Guastalla, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1913Born
10 Jun 193421.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
12 Mar 195945.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guastalla, Italy
12 Mar 195945.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
25 Apr 195945.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
6 May 196046.9SucceededBishop of Guastalla, Italy
15 Aug 197057.2DiedBishop of Guastalla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Zambarbieri (VIAF: 304918644)
Bishop Angelo Zambarbieri (born , died ) Bishop of Guastalla

EventPlace
Birth PlacePecorara, Diocese of Bobbio
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bobbio, Diocese of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano)

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1959, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018