Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Siri

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Genova-Bobbio, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1906Born
22 Sep 192822.3Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
11 Mar 194437.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
11 Mar 194437.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Livias
7 May 194437.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Livias
14 May 194639.9AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
29 May 194640.0InstalledArchbishop of Genova, Italy
12 Jan 195346.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 195346.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
16 Jan 195346.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
12 Oct 195953.3AppointedPresident of the Italian Episcopal Conference
31 Aug 196559.2ResignedPresident of the Italian Episcopal Conference
7 Mar 197467.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
30 Sep 198680.3AppointedArchbishop of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
6 Jul 198781.1RetiredArchbishop of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
2 May 198982.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Genova-Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Siri
(VIAF: 71397878; WikiData: Q473539)
Giuseppe Cardinal Siri (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Genova-Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained PriestCathedral, Genoa, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopS. Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genoa, Archdiocese of Genova
Death PlaceVilla Campostano, Albaro, Archdiocese of Genova-Bobbio
Buried Place (Original)S. Giuseppe Chapel, S. Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genoa, Archdiocese of Genova-Bobbio

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
  • a cardinal for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1944, Number 20
  • aadm: AM, 1 Apr 2023
  • d.loc: AM, 24 May 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024