Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franco Costa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

Titular Archbishop of EmmaŘs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1904Born
30 May 193126.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 196358.8AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
2 Jun 196358.9Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
18 Dec 196359.5ResignedBishop of Crema, Italy
18 Dec 196359.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of EmmaŘs
22 Jan 197772.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franco Costa
Archbishop Franco Costa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 26 Feb 2018