Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dante Bernini

Bishop Emeritus of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1922 BornLa Quercia
12 Aug 194523.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 197149.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
30 Oct 197149.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Assidona
8 Dec 197149.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assidona
10 Jul 197553.2AppointedBishop of Velletri, Italy
10 Jul 197553.2AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Oct 198159.5AppointedBishop of Velletri-Segni, Italy
8 Apr 198260.0AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
13 Nov 199977.6RetiredBishop of Albano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dante Bernini:
Bishop Dante Bernini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Albano

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Albano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013