Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Macario

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1909Born
26 May 193222.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 194838.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
21 Jun 194838.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
25 Jul 194838.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
29 Nov 196657.2AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
11 Jun 197767.7ResignedBishop of Albano, Italy
7 Dec 199384.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Albano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Macario
Bishop Raffaele Macario (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre Annunziata

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018