Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvio Cassulo

Deceased

Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1905BornCastelletto d'Orba
29 Jun 192924.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 194843.0AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
20 Jun 194843.2Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
27 Nov 196863.6DiedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvio Cassulo:
Bishop Silvio Cassulo (born , died ) Bishop of Macerata e Tolentino

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013