Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Bertoglio

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1875BornMasserano
29 Jun 189822.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 193458.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
3 Feb 193458.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
8 Apr 193458.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
15 Feb 193761.5AppointedBishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
13 Oct 195378.2DiedBishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Bertoglio:
Bishop Bernardo Bertoglio (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano)

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013