Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Montanelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1877BornLecco
14 Dec 192548.7AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
17 Jan 192648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
23 Nov 192851.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vercelli, Italy
23 Nov 192851.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
17 Feb 192951.9SucceededArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
6 May 194467.1DiedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Montanelli:
Archbishop Giacomo Montanelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Vercelli

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013