Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Maria Marelli

Deceased

Bishop of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1858Born
11 Jun 188123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Dec 190749.6AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
6 Jan 190849.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
Jun 1908³50.1InstalledBishop of Bobbio, Italy
22 Jan 191556.7AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
11 Apr 191556.9InstalledBishop of Bergamo, Italy
14 Apr 193677.9DiedBishop of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Marelli (VIAF: 254128258)
Bishop Luigi Maria Marelli (born , died ) Bishop of Bergamo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceRho, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Crypt, Cathedral, Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 84, and Page 88
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 3
  • c1/loc: AM, 8 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Apr 2019

Quantcast