Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Guido Maria Conforti

Deceased

Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1865Born
22 Sep 188823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Parma, Italy
9 Jun 190237.1AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
11 Jun 190237.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
14 Nov 190439.6ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
14 Nov 190439.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
24 Sep 190742.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
12 Dec 190742.7SucceededArchbishop (Personal Title) of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
5 Nov 193166.5DiedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy
17 Mar 1996Beatified
23 Oct 2011Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Guido Maria Conforti (VIAF: 17386096)
Archbishop St. Guido Maria Conforti (born , died ) Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavadese, Diocese of Parma
Ordained PriestCathedral, Parma, Diocese of Parma

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • cano: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2011
  • cano: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2011
  • beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 477
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 29
  • loc: AM, 8 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Apr 2019

Quantcast