Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Fermo Azzolini, S.X. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Makeni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1908BornRoccabianca, Italy
8 Apr 193122.3Ordained PriestPriest of Xaverian Missionary Fathers
19 Jul 195243.5AppointedPrefect of Makeni, Sierra Leone
24 Feb 196253.1AppointedBishop of Makeni, Sierra Leone
24 Jun 196253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Makeni, Sierra Leone
17 Nov 198677.9RetiredBishop of Makeni, Sierra Leone
24 Jul 199283.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Makeni, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Augusto Fermo Azzolini:
Bishop Augusto Fermo Azzolini S.X. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Makeni

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015