Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zhengzhou [Chengchow]

Dioecesis Cemceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 18,000 (6,952 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Min-Kun-Kiao, Zhengzhou, Henan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale}
15 May 1906ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale}
2 May 1911ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Chengchow [Zhengzhou]
3 December 1924ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Western Honan {Ho-Nan Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Chengchow [Zhengzhou]
Diocese of Zhengzhou [Chengchow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chengchow [Zhengzhou] Diocese of Zhengzhou [Chengchow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zhengzhou [Chengchow]
195020,5144,000,000.5%13112485416218ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 9 Dec 2012