Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]

Archidioecesis Chaefomensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Kaifeng, Henan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Honan {Ho-Nan Orientale}
21 September 1916ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Honan {Ho-Nan Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Honan {Ho-Nan Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kaifeng [Kaifeng] Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
195018,4874,500,000.4%1318315963817ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013