Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gao Hongxiao, O.F.M.

Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1945² Born
1989²44.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Jan 200560.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China
23 Sep 200762.7SucceededBishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gao Hongxiao
Bishop Joseph Gao Hongxiao O.F.M. (born 1945) Bishop of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast