Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

Dioecesis Zinceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lanzhou [Lanchow]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 45,000 (17,381 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Tianshui, Gansu, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Kansu {Kansu Meridionale}
28 April 1905ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kansu Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Kansu {Kansu Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kansu {Kansu Orientale}
8 March 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Kansu {Kansu Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kansu {Kansu Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Tsinchow [Tianshui]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kansu {Kansu Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Tsinchow [Tianshui]
Diocese of Tianshui [Tsinchow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tsinchow [Tianshui] Diocese of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tianshui [Tsinchow]
19508,5482,500,000.3%10182830513324ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 25 Mar 2013