Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Li Xinzheng

Deceased

Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1915Born
1 Jan 195438.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Mar 198367.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
14 Feb 198973.2DiedBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China

MicroData Summary for Stephen Li Xinzheng
Bishop Stephen Li Xinzheng (born , died ) Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast