Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Xie Shiguang

Deceased

Bishop of Xiapu [Funing], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1917Born
3 May 194931.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 198466.7Ordained BishopBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
25 Aug 200588.2DiedBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China

MicroData Summary for James Xie Shiguang
Bishop James Xie Shiguang (born , died ) Bishop of Xiapu [Funing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaoding

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast