Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimir Wang Milu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1943Born
16 Jul 198037.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 198137.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
25 Jul 200360.5ResignedBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
14 Feb 201774.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China

MicroData Summary for Casimir Wang Milu
Bishop Casimir Wang Milu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaxianshan, Gangu district
Death PlaceLanzhou

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2018, Page 1,136
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast