Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomew Yu Chengti (Chengdi)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1919Born
23 Oct 194930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
11 Dec 198162.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
2003²83.3ResignedBishop of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China
14 Sep 200990.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hanzhong [Hanchung], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartholomew Yu Chengti (Chengdi)
Bishop Bartholomew Yu Chengti (Chengdi) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hanzhong [Hanchung]

EventPlace
Death PlaceYuwang

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast