Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]

Archidioecesis Nanchinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing]
30 September 1660ErectedDiocese of Macau Vicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing] (erected)
Diocese of Nanking [Nanjing]
10 April 1690ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing] Diocese of Nanking [Nanjing]
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiangnan
21 January 1856ElevatedDiocese of Nanking [Nanjing] Vicariate Apostolic of Kiangnan
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiangsu
8 August 1921Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kiangnan Vicariate Apostolic of Kiangsu
1 May 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kiangsu
Vicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing]
1 May 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kiangsu Vicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing]
13 December 1933Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing] Vicariate Apostolic of Shanghai [Shanghai] (erected)
Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing] Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]
195032,5366,000,000.5%371047692103317ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 19 May 2013