Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]

Dioecesis Nimpuovensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hangzhou [Hangchow]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 20,059 (7,747 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Ciang-Pei-An, Catholic Mission, Ningbo, Zhejiang, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam}
15 October 1696ErectedDiocese of Nanking [Nanjing] Vicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Houkouang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuiceu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yunnan (erected)
10 May 1910Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam} Vicariate Apostolic of Western Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Occidentale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Orientale}
10 May 1910Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo]
10 August 1926Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo] Vicariate Apostolic of Taichow [Linhai] (erected)
2 July 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo] Prefecture Apostolic of Chuchow (erected)
Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ningpo [Ningbo] Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]
3 March 1949Territory LostDiocese of Ningbo [Ningpo] Diocese of Yongjia/Wenzhou [Yungkia] (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]
195017,4976,055,267.3%2529543242910110ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.7, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 Mar 2019

Quantcast