Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nicolaus Lavaissière, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam}, China

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1813Born
183521.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
23 Dec 183724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Mar 184632.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam}, China
27 Mar 184632.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
21 Feb 184733.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
19 Dec 184936.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam}, China

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nicolaus Lavaissière
Bishop Pierre Nicolaus Lavaissière C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chekiang {Ce-Kiam}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrandelles, France

  • a priest for 11.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 274
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018