Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Hu Xiande

Deceased

Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1934Born
21 Nov 198551.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 200065.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
2004²69.3SucceededBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China
25 Sep 201783.0DiedBishop of Ningbo [Ningpo], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Hu Xiande
Bishop Matthew Hu Xiande (born , died ) Bishop of Ningbo [Ningpo]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Ningbo, Diocese of Ningbo [Ningpo]

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2018, Page 1,134
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,767

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 24 Sep 2018

Quantcast