Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zhoucun [Chowtsun]

Dioecesis Ceuziienensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 5,000 (1,931 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Zhoucun, Shandong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Changtien
16 April 1929ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Changtien (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Changtien
1 June 1932ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Changtien Prefecture Apostolic of Changtien
Vicariate Apostolic of Chowtsun [Zhoucun]
18 May 1937ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Changtien Vicariate Apostolic of Chowtsun [Zhoucun] (erected)
Diocese of Zhoucun [Chowtsun]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chowtsun [Zhoucun] Diocese of Zhoucun [Chowtsun]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zhoucun [Chowtsun]
195029,4113,000,0001.0%1223358402517ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 25 Aug 2012