Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gao Kexian

Deceased

Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China

Administrator of Yantai [Yentai]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1927³Born
15 Aug 198356.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 199366.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China
1997²69.7AppointedAdministrator of Yantai [Yentai], China
24 Jan 200577.8DiedBishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Gao Kexian
Bishop John Gao Kexian (born Apr 1927, died ) Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShandong
Death PlaceBingzhou/Shandong

  • a priest for 21.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast