Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Liu Guandong

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yixian [Yihsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1919Born
29 Jun 194526.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 198263.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
5 Jan 198969.5SucceededBishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
1994²74.5RetiredBishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
28 Oct 201394.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Yixian [Yihsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Liu Guandong
Bishop Peter Liu Guandong (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yixian [Yihsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuigyuan County
Death PlaceYixian, Prefecture Apostolic of Yixian [Yihsien]

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,014, Page 1,144
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,294
  • s: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,971
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast