Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon An Shi’en

Deceased

Bishop of Daming [Taming], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1915Born
20 Apr 194429.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 198974.6Ordained BishopBishop of Daming [Taming], China
25 Mar 200287.2DiedBishop of Daming [Taming], China

MicroData Summary for Simon An Shi’en
Bishop Simon An Shi’en (born , died ) Bishop of Daming [Taming]

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast