Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Xingtai [Shunteh]

Dioecesis Scioenteanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 4,872 (1,881 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Pei-Men, Xingtai, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Shunteh [Xingtai]
2 March 1933ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Shunteh [Xingtai] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Shunteh [Xingtai]
13 January 1944ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Shunteh [Xingtai] Vicariate Apostolic of Shunteh [Xingtai]
Diocese of Xingtai [Shunteh]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Shunteh [Xingtai] Diocese of Xingtai [Shunteh]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Xingtai [Shunteh]
195021,0001,150,0001.8%4222680739ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 31 Dec 2011