Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Zhang Qingtian

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Yixian [Yihsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1956 Born
28 Nov 198529.1Ordained PriestPriest
1992²35.2SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China
14 May 199235.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Yixian [Yihsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Zhang Qingtian
Bishop John Zhang Qingtian (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Yixian [Yihsien]

Please contact the Bishop through the Prefecture Apostolic of Yixian [Yihsien].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 27 Dec 2019

Quantcast