Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Ma Zhongmu (Tegusbeleg)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1919Born
27 Jul 194727.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 198364.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
2005²85.1ResignedBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
25 Mar 2020100.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ma Zhongmu (Tegusbeleg)
Bishop Joseph Ma Zhongmu (Tegusbeleg) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yinchuan [Ningsia]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChengchuan, Inner Mongolia

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 29
  • d: CB, 26 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 27 Mar 2020

Quantcast