Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis An Shuxin

Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1946 Born
7 Jan 198134.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 199346.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
Dec 2006³60.3AppointedAdministrator of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
2007²60.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
7 Aug 201064.0InstalledBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis An Shuxin
Bishop Francis An Shuxin (born ) Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2+: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast