Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Han Dingxian

Deceased

Bishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1937Born
21 Nov 198649.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 198952.4Ordained BishopBishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China
9 Sep 200770.3DiedBishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China

MicroData Summary for Johannes Han Dingxian
Bishop Johannes Han Dingxian (born , died ) Bishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHebei
Death PlacePrison, Shijiazhuang

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • dio: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,301
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,472
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast