Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yongnian [YŁngnien]

Dioecesis Iomnienina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Chaokiachwang, Weixian, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian]
24 May 1929ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian] (Siensien) (Weihsien, Tsingho, Kitseh, Kuchow, Yungnien, Feisiang, Kwangping, Chengan, Hantan, and Tzechow) Prefecture Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian]
6 March 1933ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian] Vicariate Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian]
Diocese of Yongnian [YŁngnien]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian] Diocese of Yongnian [YŁngnien]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 21, Page 655, and Page 656
  • Vicariate Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 25, Page 490
  • Diocese of Yongnian [YŁngnien]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 301, to Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024